Menu

Quick Search

Enter locomotive number in the box below and press 'Go'!

Content is coming here as you probably can see. Content is coming here as you probably can see.


?

In Touch

Bookmark and Share

Follow BRDatabase on Twitter

Advertising



Counter

Ad Visitor Statistics
» 9 Online
» 109 Today
» 1091 Yesterday
» 7563 Week
» 10145 Month
» 274778 Year
» 1496343 Total
Record: 1668 (12/02/2017)
(Free MySQL Counter)

Manufacturer: Swindon Works



Order Details for Lot No: SW/401
Builder Swindon Works
Order Date 1953
For 20 Steam locomotives
Class Standard Class 4

Number (as built) Works Number Class Built For Designer Wheels Date to Service Date Withdrawn Info
75030   Standard Class 4 BR Riddles 4-6-0 06/1953 30/12/1967  
75031   Standard Class 4 BR Riddles 4-6-0 06/1953 12/02/1966  
75032   Standard Class 4 BR Riddles 4-6-0 06/1953 17/02/1968  
75033   Standard Class 4 BR Riddles 4-6-0 07/1953 30/12/1967  
75034   Standard Class 4 BR Riddles 4-6-0 07/1953 10/02/1968  
75035   Standard Class 4 BR Riddles 4-6-0 08/1953 22/07/1967  
75036   Standard Class 4 BR Riddles 4-6-0 08/1953 11/06/1966  
75037   Standard Class 4 BR Riddles 4-6-0 08/1953 30/12/1967  
75038   Standard Class 4 BR Riddles 4-6-0 08/1953 25/12/1965  
75039   Standard Class 4 BR Riddles 4-6-0 08/1953 23/09/1967  
75040   Standard Class 4 BR Riddles 4-6-0 08/1953 21/10/1967  
75041   Standard Class 4 BR Riddles 4-6-0 08/1953 27/01/1968  
75042   Standard Class 4 BR Riddles 4-6-0 09/1953 04/11/1967  
75043   Standard Class 4 BR Riddles 4-6-0 09/1953 30/12/1967  
75044   Standard Class 4 BR Riddles 4-6-0 09/1953 12/03/1966  
75045   Standard Class 4 BR Riddles 4-6-0 09/1953 23/04/1966  
75046   Standard Class 4 BR Riddles 4-6-0 09/1953 12/08/1967  
75047   Standard Class 4 BR Riddles 4-6-0 10/1953 12/08/1967  
75048   Standard Class 4 BR Riddles 4-6-0 10/1953 03/08/1968  
75049   Standard Class 4 BR Riddles 4-6-0 10/1953 08/10/1966