Menu

Quick Search

Enter locomotive number in the box below and press 'Go'!

Content is coming here as you probably can see. Content is coming here as you probably can see.


?

In Touch

Bookmark and Share

Follow BRDatabase on Twitter

Advertising



Counter

Ad Visitor Statistics
» 2 Online
» 98 Today
» 1224 Yesterday
» 3910 Week
» 33408 Month
» 370254 Year
» 1591819 Total
Record: 1668 (12/02/2017)
(Free MySQL Counter)

Manufacturer: Swindon Works



Order Details for Lot No: SW/408
Builder Swindon Works
Order Date 1956
For 15 Steam locomotives
Class Standard Class 4

Number (as built) Works Number Class Built For Designer Wheels Date to Service Date Withdrawn Info
75050   Standard Class 4 BR Riddles 4-6-0 09/11/1956 26/11/1966  
75051   Standard Class 4 BR Riddles 4-6-0 27/11/1956 29/10/1966  
75052   Standard Class 4 BR Riddles 4-6-0 20/12/1956 12/08/1967  
75053   Standard Class 4 BR Riddles 4-6-0 01/1957 10/09/1966  
75054   Standard Class 4 BR Riddles 4-6-0 17/01/1957 27/08/1966  
75055   Standard Class 4 BR Riddles 4-6-0 23/01/1957 27/05/1967  
75056   Standard Class 4 BR Riddles 4-6-0 28/02/1957 11/06/1966  
75057   Standard Class 4 BR Riddles 4-6-0 03/1957 12/02/1966  
75058   Standard Class 4 BR Riddles 4-6-0 08/04/1957 30/12/1967  
75059   Standard Class 4 BR Riddles 4-6-0 15/04/1957 22/07/1967  
75060   Standard Class 4 BR Riddles 4-6-0 02/05/1957 22/04/1967  
75061   Standard Class 4 BR Riddles 4-6-0 15/05/1957 04/02/1967  
75062   Standard Class 4 BR Riddles 4-6-0 28/05/1957 10/02/1968  
75063   Standard Class 4 BR Riddles 4-6-0 13/06/1957 28/05/1966  
75064   Standard Class 4 BR Riddles 4-6-0 26/06/1957 20/05/1967