Menu

Quick Search

Enter locomotive number in the box below and press 'Go'!

Content is coming here as you probably can see. Content is coming here as you probably can see.


?

In Touch

Bookmark and Share

Follow BRDatabase on Twitter

Advertising



Counter

Ad Visitor Statistics
» 12 Online
» 84 Today
» 1224 Yesterday
» 3896 Week
» 33394 Month
» 370240 Year
» 1591805 Total
Record: 1668 (12/02/2017)
(Free MySQL Counter)

Manufacturer: Swindon Works



Order Details for Lot No: SW/409
Builder Swindon Works
Order Date 1956
For 15 Steam locomotives
Class Standard Class 4

Number (as built) Works Number Class Built For Designer Wheels Date to Service Date Withdrawn Info
75065   Standard Class 4 BR Riddles 4-6-0 26/08/1955 04/09/1966  
75066   Standard Class 4 BR Riddles 4-6-0 01/09/1955 02/1966  
75067   Standard Class 4 BR Riddles 4-6-0 12/09/1955 04/10/1964  
75068   Standard Class 4 BR Riddles 4-6-0 15/09/1955 02/07/1967  
75069   Standard Class 4 BR Riddles 4-6-0 28/09/1955 25/09/1966  
75070   Standard Class 4 BR Riddles 4-6-0 13/10/1955 11/09/1966  
75071   Standard Class 4 BR Riddles 4-6-0 26/10/1955 12/08/1967  
75072   Standard Class 4 BR Riddles 4-6-0 01/11/1955 31/12/1965  
75073   Standard Class 4 BR Riddles 4-6-0 30/11/1955 31/12/1965  
75074   Standard Class 4 BR Riddles 4-6-0 18/11/1955 09/07/1967  
75075   Standard Class 4 BR Riddles 4-6-0 25/11/1955 09/07/1967  
75076   Standard Class 4 BR Riddles 4-6-0 09/12/1955 09/07/1967  
75077   Standard Class 4 BR Riddles 4-6-0 29/12/1955 09/07/1967  
75078   Standard Class 4 BR Riddles 4-6-0 20/01/1956 10/07/1966  
75079   Standard Class 4 BR Riddles 4-6-0 20/01/1956 20/11/1966