Manufacturer: Swindon Works
Builder | Swindon Works |
Order Date | 1884 |
For | 20 Steam locomotives |
Class | Dean Goods |
Number (as built) | Works Number | Class | Built For | Designer | Wheels | Date to Service | Date Withdrawn | Info |
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
2355 | 1000 | Dean Goods | GWR | Dean | 0-6-0 | 12/1884 | 03/1930 | |
2356 | 1001 | Dean Goods | GWR | Dean | 0-6-0 | 12/1884 | 26/07/1948 | |
2357 | 1002 | Dean Goods | GWR | Dean | 0-6-0 | 12/1884 | 07/1935 | |
2358 | 1003 | Dean Goods | GWR | Dean | 0-6-0 | 12/1884 | 16/11/1934 | |
2359 | 1004 | Dean Goods | GWR | Dean | 0-6-0 | 12/1884 | 12/1935 | |
2360 | 1005 | Dean Goods | GWR | Dean | 0-6-0 | 12/1884 | 22/02/1945 | |
2341 | 986 | Dean Goods | GWR | Dean | 0-6-0 | 07/1884 | 03/11/1934 | |
2342 | 987 | Dean Goods | GWR | Dean | 0-6-0 | 08/1884 | 08/1938 | |
2343 | 988 | Dean Goods | GWR | Dean | 0-6-0 | 08/1884 | 24/02/1953 | |
2344 | 989 | Dean Goods | GWR | Dean | 0-6-0 | 08/1884 | 02/1931 | |
2345 | 990 | Dean Goods | GWR | Dean | 0-6-0 | 09/1884 | 03/05/1947 | |
2346 | 991 | Dean Goods | GWR | Dean | 0-6-0 | 09/1884 | 09/1936 | |
2347 | 992 | Dean Goods | GWR | Dean | 0-6-0 | 10/1884 | 04/1938 | |
2348 | 993 | Dean Goods | GWR | Dean | 0-6-0 | 10/1884 | 28/07/1945 | |
2349 | 994 | Dean Goods | GWR | Dean | 0-6-0 | 11/1884 | 26/03/1952 | |
2350 | 995 | Dean Goods | GWR | Dean | 0-6-0 | 11/1884 | 29/01/1953 | |
2351 | 996 | Dean Goods | GWR | Dean | 0-6-0 | 11/1884 | 20/02/1953 | |
2352 | 997 | Dean Goods | GWR | Dean | 0-6-0 | 11/1884 | 05/1935 | |
2353 | 998 | Dean Goods | GWR | Dean | 0-6-0 | 11/1884 | 12/1936 | |
2354 | 999 | Dean Goods | GWR | Dean | 0-6-0 | 11/1884 | 27/04/1953 |