Manufacturer: Swindon Works
Builder | Swindon Works |
Order Date | 1899 |
For | 20 Steam locomotives |
Class | 2721 |
Number (as built) | Works Number | Class | Built For | Designer | Wheels | Date to Service | Date Withdrawn | Info |
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
2741 | 1703 | 2721 | GWR | Dean | 0-6-0PT | 04/1899 | 19/10/1945 | |
2742 | 1704 | 2721 | GWR | Dean | 0-6-0PT | 04/1899 | 24/10/1945 | |
2743 | 1705 | 2721 | GWR | Dean | 0-6-0PT | 04/1899 | 02/10/1950 | |
2744 | 1706 | 2721 | GWR | Dean | 0-6-0PT | 04/1899 | 08/11/1950 | |
2745 | 1707 | 2721 | GWR | Dean | 0-6-0PT | 05/1899 | 30/01/1950 | |
2746 | 1708 | 2721 | GWR | Dean | 0-6-0PT | 05/1899 | 10/07/1948 | |
2747 | 1709 | 2721 | GWR | Dean | 0-6-0PT | 05/1899 | 03/11/1945 | |
2748 | 1710 | 2721 | GWR | Dean | 0-6-0PT | 05/1899 | 24/04/1948 | |
2749 | 1711 | 2721 | GWR | Dean | 0-6-0PT | 05/1899 | 24/04/1948 | |
2750 | 1712 | 2721 | GWR | Dean | 0-6-0PT | 06/1899 | 03/11/1945 | |
2751 | 1713 | 2721 | GWR | Dean | 0-6-0PT | 06/1899 | 24/04/1948 | |
2752 | 1714 | 2721 | GWR | Dean | 0-6-0PT | 06/1899 | 01/03/1948 | |
2753 | 1715 | 2721 | GWR | Dean | 0-6-0PT | 07/1899 | 03/11/1945 | |
2754 | 1716 | 2721 | GWR | Dean | 0-6-0PT | 07/1899 | 02/10/1950 | |
2755 | 1717 | 2721 | GWR | Dean | 0-6-0PT | 07/1899 | 16/08/1948 | |
2756 | 1718 | 2721 | GWR | Dean | 0-6-0PT | 08/1899 | 17/05/1949 | |
2757 | 1719 | 2721 | GWR | Dean | 0-6-0PT | 08/1899 | 03/02/1950 | |
2758 | 1720 | 2721 | GWR | Dean | 0-6-0PT | 08/1899 | 15/12/1945 | |
2759 | 1721 | 2721 | GWR | Dean | 0-6-0PT | 08/1899 | 19/10/1945 | |
2760 | 1722 | 2721 | GWR | Dean | 0-6-0PT | 08/1899 | 23/10/1950 |