Manufacturer: Vulcan Foundry
Builder | Vulcan Foundry |
Order Date | 01/1946 |
For | 50 Steam locomotives |
Class | B1 |
Number (as built) | Works Number | Class | Built For | Designer | Wheels | Date to Service | Date Withdrawn | Info |
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
1140 | 5498 | B1 | LNER | Thompson | 4-6-0 | 11/04/1947 | 31/12/1966 | |
1141 | 5499 | B1 | LNER | Thompson | 4-6-0 | 11/04/1947 | 25/07/1965 | |
1142 | 5500 | B1 | LNER | Thompson | 4-6-0 | 15/04/1947 | 22/09/1963 | |
1143 | 5501 | B1 | LNER | Thompson | 4-6-0 | 15/04/1947 | 24/02/1964 | |
1144 | 5502 | B1 | LNER | Thompson | 4-6-0 | 17/04/1947 | 19/04/1964 | |
1145 | 5503 | B1 | LNER | Thompson | 4-6-0 | 17/04/1947 | 02/01/1966 | |
1146 | 5504 | B1 | LNER | Thompson | 4-6-0 | 22/04/1947 | 12/03/1964 | |
1147 | 5505 | B1 | LNER | Thompson | 4-6-0 | 22/04/1947 | 16/12/1965 | |
1148 | 5506 | B1 | LNER | Thompson | 4-6-0 | 25/04/1947 | 02/09/1966 | |
1149 | 5507 | B1 | LNER | Thompson | 4-6-0 | 25/04/1947 | 23/09/1962 | |
1150 | 5508 | B1 | LNER | Thompson | 4-6-0 | 29/04/1947 | 16/09/1962 | |
1151 | 5509 | B1 | LNER | Thompson | 4-6-0 | 29/04/1947 | 16/09/1962 | |
1152 | 5510 | B1 | LNER | Thompson | 4-6-0 | 02/05/1947 | 19/04/1964 | |
1153 | 5511 | B1 | LNER | Thompson | 4-6-0 | 02/05/1947 | 17/01/1965 | |
1154 | 5512 | B1 | LNER | Thompson | 4-6-0 | 06/05/1947 | 16/09/1962 | |
1155 | 5513 | B1 | LNER | Thompson | 4-6-0 | 06/05/1947 | 01/03/1964 | |
1156 | 5514 | B1 | LNER | Thompson | 4-6-0 | 09/05/1947 | 25/11/1963 | |
1157 | 5515 | B1 | LNER | Thompson | 4-6-0 | 09/05/1947 | 01/08/1965 | |
1158 | 5516 | B1 | LNER | Thompson | 4-6-0 | 14/05/1947 | 17/04/1966 | |
1159 | 5517 | B1 | LNER | Thompson | 4-6-0 | 14/05/1947 | 22/09/1963 | |
1160 | 5518 | B1 | LNER | Thompson | 4-6-0 | 16/05/1947 | 22/09/1963 | |
1161 | 5519 | B1 | LNER | Thompson | 4-6-0 | 16/05/1947 | 06/12/1966 | |
1162 | 5520 | B1 | LNER | Thompson | 4-6-0 | 21/05/1947 | 08/12/1964 | |
1163 | 5521 | B1 | LNER | Thompson | 4-6-0 | 23/05/1947 | 16/09/1962 | |
1164 | 5522 | B1 | LNER | Thompson | 4-6-0 | 23/05/1947 | 10/09/1962 | |
1165 | 5523 | B1 | LNER | Thompson | 4-6-0 | 28/05/1947 | 01/11/1964 | |
1166 | 5524 | B1 | LNER | Thompson | 4-6-0 | 30/05/1947 | 16/09/1962 | |
1167 | 5525 | B1 | LNER | Thompson | 4-6-0 | 30/05/1947 | 06/12/1964 | |
1168 | 5526 | B1 | LNER | Thompson | 4-6-0 | 04/06/1947 | 03/10/1965 | |
1169 | 5527 | B1 | LNER | Thompson | 4-6-0 | 06/06/1947 | 28/12/1963 | |
1170 | 5528 | B1 | LNER | Thompson | 4-6-0 | 06/06/1947 | 09/07/1962 | |
1171 | 5529 | B1 | LNER | Thompson | 4-6-0 | 11/06/1947 | 16/09/1962 | |
1172 | 5530 | B1 | LNER | Thompson | 4-6-0 | 09/06/1947 | 16/12/1965 | |
1173 | 5531 | B1 | LNER | Thompson | 4-6-0 | 09/06/1947 | 23/01/1967 | |
1174 | 5532 | B1 | LNER | Thompson | 4-6-0 | 18/06/1947 | 28/12/1963 | |
1175 | 5533 | B1 | LNER | Thompson | 4-6-0 | 18/06/1947 | 28/12/1963 | |
1176 | 5534 | B1 | LNER | Thompson | 4-6-0 | 17/06/1947 | 07/11/1965 | |
1177 | 5535 | B1 | LNER | Thompson | 4-6-0 | 25/06/1947 | 22/09/1963 | |
1178 | 5536 | B1 | LNER | Thompson | 4-6-0 | 23/06/1947 | 13/02/1964 | |
1179 | 5537 | B1 | LNER | Thompson | 4-6-0 | 27/06/1947 | 10/01/1965 | |
1180 | 5538 | B1 | LNER | Thompson | 4-6-0 | 30/06/1947 | 01/05/1967 | |
1181 | 5539 | B1 | LNER | Thompson | 4-6-0 | 02/07/1947 | 25/11/1963 | |
1182 | 5540 | B1 | LNER | Thompson | 4-6-0 | 04/07/1947 | 16/09/1962 | |
1183 | 5541 | B1 | LNER | Thompson | 4-6-0 | 09/07/1947 | 09/07/1962 | |
1184 | 5542 | B1 | LNER | Thompson | 4-6-0 | 09/07/1947 | 29/12/1962 | |
1185 | 5543 | B1 | LNER | Thompson | 4-6-0 | 09/07/1947 | 11/10/1964 | |
1186 | 5544 | B1 | LNER | Thompson | 4-6-0 | 16/07/1947 | 05/11/1962 | |
1187 | 5545 | B1 | LNER | Thompson | 4-6-0 | 29/07/1947 | 03/09/1962 | |
1188 | 5546 | B1 | LNER | Thompson | 4-6-0 | 29/07/1947 | 14/11/1965 | |
1189 | 5547 | B1 | LNER | Thompson | 4-6-0 | 08/08/1947 | 11/05/1967 |