Menu

Quick Search

Enter locomotive number in the box below and press 'Go'!

Content is coming here as you probably can see. Content is coming here as you probably can see.


?

In Touch

Bookmark and Share

Follow BRDatabase on Twitter

Advertising



Counter

Ad Visitor Statistics
» 7 Online
» 828 Today
» 834 Yesterday
» 3388 Week
» 16421 Month
» 238822 Year
» 1123203 Total
Record: 1668 (12/02/2017)
(Free MySQL Counter)

Manufacturer: Vulcan Foundry



Order Details for Lot No: VF/636
Builder Vulcan Foundry
Order Date 1921
For 10 Steam locomotives
Class B7

Number (as built) Works Number Class Built For Designer Wheels Date to Service Date Withdrawn Info
36 3478 B7 GCR Robinson 4-6-0 09/1921 12/06/1948  
37 3479 B7 GCR Robinson 4-6-0 10/1921 12/06/1948  
38 3480 B7 GCR Robinson 4-6-0 10/1921 13/06/1949  
458 3481 B7 GCR Robinson 4-6-0 10/1921 31/12/1948  
459 3482 B7 GCR Robinson 4-6-0 10/1921 05/09/1949  
460 3483 B7 GCR Robinson 4-6-0 10/1921 06/10/1948  
461 3484 B7 GCR Robinson 4-6-0 11/1921 21/08/1948  
462 3485 B7 GCR Robinson 4-6-0 11/1921 19/11/1948  
463 3486 B7 GCR Robinson 4-6-0 11/1921 22/01/1949  
464 3487 B7 GCR Robinson 4-6-0 11/1921 10/09/1948