Manufacturer: Wolverhampton Works (Stafford Road)
Builder | Wolverhampton Works (Stafford Road) |
Order Date | 1896 |
For | 20 Steam locomotives |
Class | 655 |
Built For | GWR |
Number (as built) | Works Number | Class | Built For | Designer | Wheels | Date to Service | Date Withdrawn | Info |
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
2701 | 605 | 655 | GWR | Dean | 0-6-0ST | 01/1896 | 03/11/1945 | |
2702 | 606 | 655 | GWR | Dean | 0-6-0ST | 02/1896 | 09/01/1950 | |
2703 | 607 | 655 | GWR | Dean | 0-6-0ST | 02/1896 | 03/11/1945 | |
2704 | 608 | 655 | GWR | Dean | 0-6-0ST | 03/1896 | 14/03/1950 | |
2705 | 609 | 655 | GWR | Dean | 0-6-0ST | 03/1896 | 10/02/1945 | |
2706 | 610 | 655 | GWR | Dean | 0-6-0ST | 04/1896 | 18/10/1948 | |
2707 | 611 | 655 | GWR | Dean | 0-6-0ST | 05/1896 | 15/07/1950 | |
2708 | 612 | 655 | GWR | Dean | 0-6-0ST | 06/1896 | 06/07/1949 | |
2709 | 613 | 655 | GWR | Dean | 0-6-0ST | 06/1896 | 07/09/1948 | |
2710 | 614 | 655 | GWR | Dean | 0-6-0ST | 06/1896 | 03/11/1945 | |
2711 | 615 | 655 | GWR | Dean | 0-6-0ST | 07/1896 | 03/11/1945 | |
2712 | 616 | 655 | GWR | Dean | 0-6-0ST | 08/1896 | 28/03/1950 | |
2713 | 617 | 655 | GWR | Dean | 0-6-0ST | 09/1896 | 12/09/1949 | |
2714 | 618 | 655 | GWR | Dean | 0-6-0ST | 09/1896 | 10/05/1948 | |
2715 | 619 | 655 | GWR | Dean | 0-6-0ST | 10/1896 | 17/07/1950 | |
2716 | 620 | 655 | GWR | Dean | 0-6-0ST | 11/1896 | 0000 | |
2717 | 621 | 655 | GWR | Dean | 0-6-0ST | 11/1896 | 21/10/1948 | |
2718 | 622 | 655 | GWR | Dean | 0-6-0ST | 12/1896 | 19/10/1945 | |
2719 | 623 | 655 | GWR | Dean | 0-6-0ST | 12/1896 | 06/11/1950 | |
2720 | 624 | 655 | GWR | Dean | 0-6-0ST | 02/1897 | 03/11/1945 |