Manufacturer: Wolverhampton Works (Stafford Road)
Builder | Wolverhampton Works (Stafford Road) |
Order Date | 1881 |
For | 12 Steam locomotives |
Class | 1901 |
Built For | GWR |
Number (as built) | Works Number | Class | Built For | Designer | Wheels | Date to Service | Date Withdrawn | Info |
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
1901 | 410 | 1901 | GWR | Armstrong | 0-6-0PT | 08/1881 | 09/1929 | |
1902 | 411 | 1901 | GWR | Armstrong | 0-6-0PT | 09/1881 | 22/10/1943 | |
1903 | 412 | 1901 | GWR | Armstrong | 0-6-0PT | 09/1881 | 06/06/1952 | |
1904 | 413 | 1901 | GWR | Armstrong | 0-6-0PT | 10/1881 | 12/1934 | |
1905 | 414 | 1901 | GWR | Armstrong | 0-6-0PT | 10/1881 | 10/1936 | |
1906 | 415 | 1901 | GWR | Armstrong | 0-6-0PT | 11/1881 | 07/1932 | |
1907 | 416 | 1901 | GWR | Armstrong | 0-6-0PT | 11/1881 | 11/01/1950 | |
1908 | 417 | 1901 | GWR | Armstrong | 0-6-0PT | 12/1881 | 11/1936 | |
1909 | 418 | 1901 | GWR | Armstrong | 0-6-0PT | 01/1882 | 11/11/1949 | |
1910 | 419 | 1901 | GWR | Armstrong | 0-6-0PT | 04/1882 | 08/07/1944 | |
1911 | 420 | 1901 | GWR | Armstrong | 0-6-0PT | 04/1882 | 05/1936 | |
1912 | 421 | 1901 | GWR | Armstrong | 0-6-0PT | 04/1882 | 30/12/1949 |