Manufacturer: Wolverhampton Works (Stafford Road)
Builder | Wolverhampton Works (Stafford Road) |
Order Date | 1891 |
For | 12 Steam locomotives |
Class | 1901 |
Built For | GWR |
Number (as built) | Works Number | Class | Built For | Designer | Wheels | Date to Service | Date Withdrawn | Info |
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
1985 | 527 | 1901 | GWR | Armstrong | 0-6-0PT | 02/1891 | 16/07/1934 | |
1986 | 528 | 1901 | GWR | Armstrong | 0-6-0PT | 03/1891 | 10/1929 | |
1987 | 529 | 1901 | GWR | Armstrong | 0-6-0PT | 03/1891 | 01/1929 | |
1988 | 530 | 1901 | GWR | Armstrong | 0-6-0PT | 05/1891 | 08/01/1947 | |
1989 | 531 | 1901 | GWR | Armstrong | 0-6-0PT | 06/1891 | 25/09/1950 | |
1990 | 532 | 1901 | GWR | Armstrong | 0-6-0PT | 06/1891 | 02/11/1949 | |
1991 | 533 | 1901 | GWR | Armstrong | 0-6-0PT | 07/1891 | 26/01/1953 | |
1992 | 534 | 1901 | GWR | Armstrong | 0-6-0PT | 07/1891 | 03/1935 | |
1993 | 535 | 1901 | GWR | Armstrong | 0-6-0PT | 08/1891 | 19/04/1951 | |
1994 | 536 | 1901 | GWR | Armstrong | 0-6-0PT | 08/1891 | 10/1938 | |
1995 | 537 | 1901 | GWR | Armstrong | 0-6-0PT | 09/1891 | 08/1930 | |
1996 | 538 | 1901 | GWR | Armstrong | 0-6-0PT | 10/1891 | 05/01/1953 |