Manufacturer: Yorkshire Engine Company
Builder | Yorkshire Engine Company |
Order Date | 1949 |
For | 30 Steam locomotives |
Class | 94xx |
Number (as built) | Works Number | Class | Built For | Designer | Wheels | Date to Service | Date Withdrawn | Info |
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
8450 | 2443 | 94xx | GWR | Hawksworth | 0-6-0PT | 30/08/1949 | 22/06/1959 | |
8451 | 2444 | 94xx | GWR | Hawksworth | 0-6-0PT | 19/09/1949 | 10/11/1961 | |
8452 | 2445 | 94xx | GWR | Hawksworth | 0-6-0PT | 28/10/1949 | 20/04/1964 | |
8453 | 2446 | 94xx | GWR | Hawksworth | 0-6-0PT | 18/11/1949 | 05/10/1962 | |
8454 | 2447 | 94xx | GWR | Hawksworth | 0-6-0PT | 16/12/1949 | 12/01/1961 | |
8455 | 2448 | 94xx | GWR | Hawksworth | 0-6-0PT | 06/01/1950 | 11/01/1960 | |
8456 | 2449 | 94xx | GWR | Hawksworth | 0-6-0PT | 03/02/1950 | 21/10/1963 | |
8457 | 2450 | 94xx | GWR | Hawksworth | 0-6-0PT | 24/03/1950 | 12/01/1961 | |
8458 | 2451 | 94xx | GWR | Hawksworth | 0-6-0PT | 03/04/1950 | 29/08/1963 | |
8459 | 2452 | 94xx | GWR | Hawksworth | 0-6-0PT | 31/05/1950 | 03/06/1965 | |
8460 | 2453 | 94xx | GWR | Hawksworth | 0-6-0PT | 05/06/1950 | 12/01/1961 | |
8461 | 2454 | 94xx | GWR | Hawksworth | 0-6-0PT | 22/06/1950 | 29/11/1963 | |
8462 | 2455 | 94xx | GWR | Hawksworth | 0-6-0PT | 27/07/1950 | 17/08/1959 | |
8463 | 2456 | 94xx | GWR | Hawksworth | 0-6-0PT | 22/09/1950 | 11/01/1960 | |
8464 | 2457 | 94xx | GWR | Hawksworth | 0-6-0PT | 13/10/1950 | 28/12/1963 | |
8465 | 2458 | 94xx | GWR | Hawksworth | 0-6-0PT | 02/11/1950 | 22/11/1963 | |
8466 | 2459 | 94xx | GWR | Hawksworth | 0-6-0PT | 03/11/1950 | 06/07/1964 | |
8467 | 2460 | 94xx | GWR | Hawksworth | 0-6-0PT | 06/02/1951 | 13/02/1962 | |
8468 | 2461 | 94xx | GWR | Hawksworth | 0-6-0PT | 15/02/1951 | 09/05/1960 | |
8469 | 2462 | 94xx | GWR | Hawksworth | 0-6-0PT | 31/03/1951 | 06/11/1964 | |
8470 | 2463 | 94xx | GWR | Hawksworth | 0-6-0PT | 03/05/1951 | 08/01/1962 | |
8471 | 2464 | 94xx | GWR | Hawksworth | 0-6-0PT | 31/05/1951 | 16/06/1965 | |
8472 | 2465 | 94xx | GWR | Hawksworth | 0-6-0PT | 27/07/1951 | 08/03/1963 | |
8478 | 2466 | 94xx | GWR | Hawksworth | 0-6-0PT | 27/05/1952 | 29/01/1963 | |
8473 | 2467 | 94xx | GWR | Hawksworth | 0-6-0PT | 27/08/1951 | 12/01/1961 | |
8474 | 2468 | 94xx | GWR | Hawksworth | 0-6-0PT | 31/10/1951 | 07/05/1965 | |
8475 | 2469 | 94xx | GWR | Hawksworth | 0-6-0PT | 30/11/1951 | 07/09/1964 | |
8476 | 2470 | 94xx | GWR | Hawksworth | 0-6-0PT | 06/03/1952 | 12/01/1961 | |
8477 | 2471 | 94xx | GWR | Hawksworth | 0-6-0PT | 14/03/1952 | 13/07/1962 | |
8479 | 2472 | 94xx | GWR | Hawksworth | 0-6-0PT | 30/06/1952 | 09/10/1964 |