Menu

Quick Search

Enter locomotive number in the box below and press 'Go'!

Content is coming here as you probably can see. Content is coming here as you probably can see.


?

In Touch

Bookmark and Share

Follow BRDatabase on Twitter

Advertising



Counter

Ad Visitor Statistics
» 1 Online
» 168 Today
» 1008 Yesterday
» 6323 Week
» 16493 Month
» 294289 Year
» 1178670 Total
Record: 1668 (12/02/2017)
(Free MySQL Counter)

Manufacturer: Yorkshire Engine Company



Order Details for Lot No: YE/YE980
Builder Yorkshire Engine Company
Order Date 1905
For 5 Steam locomotives
Class J11

Number (as built) Works Number Class Built For Designer Wheels Date to Service Date Withdrawn Info
1078 820 J11 GCR Robinson 0-6-0 08/1905 23/09/1962  
1079 821 J11 GCR Robinson 0-6-0 08/1905 28/06/1960  
  822 J11 GCR Robinson 0-6-0 08/1904 12/03/1959  
1081 823 J11 GCR Robinson 0-6-0 09/1905 23/01/1960  
1082 824 J11 GCR Robinson 0-6-0 09/1905 02/05/1955