Menu
Quick Search
Enter locomotive number in the box below and press 'Go'!
In Touch
Donations
Counter
Visitor Statistics
|
» 11 Online
» 816 Today
» 4397 Yesterday
» 18619 Week
» 71635 Month
» 191162 Year
» 3218015 Total
|
Record: 10235 (26/09/2023)
(Free MySQL Counter)
|
Depot: Alexandra Dock (Hull)
Depot Details
Depot Name |
Alexandra Dock (Hull) |
Depot Codes |
Code | From | To | 53C | 01/12/1958 | 14/11/1960 |
|
Date Opened |
20/07/1885 |
Date Closed |
14/11/1960 |
Pre Grouping Company |
HBR |
Big 4 Company |
LNER |
British Railways Region |
ER |
Information |
Stayed open as a stabling point until 27th October 1963 |
1947 Directions |
The shed is in Hull Dockland.
Turn right outside Hull Paragon Station into Paragon Square.
Turn left into Carr Lane, and continue across the square into Alfred
Street. Continue into Gelder Street, and over Drypool Bridge. Turn
right into Great Union Street, and bear left into Hedon Road. Enter
Alexandra Dock by the main gate and bear left along the dock road.
This passes the shed office on the left-hand side. There is no shed
and the locos stand on a pit. Walking time 40 minutes.
A bus service labelled No. 47 Hedon Road operates from the City
to Alexandra Dock.
|
Popup Maps (New Window) |
25 Inch (1892-1914) OS (1:25,000) (1937-1961) OS 7th Series 1 inch (1:63,360) |
Chronology |
Date | Event | 20/07/1885 | Depot opened | 01/12/1958 | Change of code to 53C | 14/11/1960 | Depot closed |
|
|
|