Menu
Quick Search
Enter locomotive number in the box below and press 'Go'!
In Touch
Donations
Counter
Visitor Statistics
|
» 13 Online
» 789 Today
» 5784 Yesterday
» 6573 Week
» 27962 Month
» 147489 Year
» 3174342 Total
|
Record: 10235 (26/09/2023)
(Free MySQL Counter)
|
Depot: Corkerhill
Depot Details
Depot Name |
Corkerhill |
Depot Codes |
Code | From | To | 27J | 1896 | 31/12/1939 | 30A | 01/01/1940 | 31/01/1949 | 67A | 01/01/1949 | 05/05/1973 | CK | 06/05/1973 | |
|
Date Opened |
1896 |
Pre Grouping Company |
GSWR |
Big 4 Company |
LMS |
British Railways Region |
ScR |
1947 Directions |
The shed is on the south side of the line east of the station. The
yard is visible from the line.
Turn left outside the station along Corkerhill Road. About 200
yards further on a cinder path leads from the left hand side of the
road (by the Railway Mission Building) to the shed. Walking time
5 minutes. |
Popup Maps (New Window) |
25 Inch (1892-1914) OS (1:25,000) (1937-1961) OS 7th Series 1 inch (1:63,360) |
Chronology |
Date | Event | 1875 | Change of code to 30A | 01/01/1949 | Change of code to 67A | 06/05/1973 | Change of code to CK |
|
|
|