Menu

Quick Search

Enter locomotive number in the box below and press 'Go'!

Content is coming here as you probably can see. Content is coming here as you probably can see.


?

In Touch

Bookmark and Share

Follow BRDatabase on Twitter

Advertising



Counter

Ad Visitor Statistics
» 14 Online
» 196 Today
» 844 Yesterday
» 4462 Week
» 16240 Month
» 305632 Year
» 816734 Total
Record: 1668 (12/02/2017)
(Free MySQL Counter)

Depot: Hull Dairycoates


Depot Details
Depot Name Hull Dairycoates
Depot Codes
CodeFromTo
HLD187531/01/1950
53A01/02/195031/12/1959
50B01/01/196021/09/1970
Date Opened 1863
Date Closed 21/09/1970
Pre Grouping Company NER
Big 4 Company LNER
British Railways Region ER
1947 Directions The shed is in a maze of lines just south of the main line to Hessle. The yard is partially visible from the line.
Turn right outside Paragon Station into Paragon Square. Turn right into Carr Lane, left into Porter Street, and bear right into Hessle Road. About 1¾ miles further on turn left into a private L.N.E.R. road, just before a level-crossing. A footbridge leads from this road to the shed.
Walking time 35 minutes.
A trolley bus service labelled Dairycoates runs along Hessle Road to the level-crossing.
Popup Maps (New Window) Street Map (1:25,000)
Town Map (1:50,000)
Road Map (1:100,000)
Road Map (1:200,000)
County Map (1:500,000)
Regional Map (1:1,000,000)
Chronology
DateEvent
1863Depot opened
1875Change of code to HLD
01/02/1950Change of code to 53A
01/01/1960Change of code to 50B
24/06/1967Closed to steam locomotives
21/09/1970Depot closed