Menu

Quick Search

Enter locomotive number in the box below and press 'Go'!

Content is coming here as you probably can see. Content is coming here as you probably can see.


?

In Touch

Bookmark and Share

Follow BRDatabase on Twitter

Advertising



Counter

Ad Visitor Statistics
» 11 Online
» 222 Today
» 839 Yesterday
» 222 Week
» 18543 Month
» 106735 Year
» 991116 Total
Record: 1668 (12/02/2017)
(Free MySQL Counter)

Depot: Sheffield Darnall


Depot Details
Depot Name Sheffield Darnall
Depot Codes
CodeFromTo
SHF11/04/194331/01/1950
39B01/02/195031/05/1955
41A01/06/195531/03/1964
41B01/04/196404/10/1965
DA06/05/1973
Date Opened 11/04/1943
Date Closed 04/10/1965
Big 4 Company LNER
British Railways Region ER
1947 Directions The shed is on the south side of the line west of Darnall Station. The yard is visible from the line.
Turn into Station Road outside Damall Station. At the end of Station Road turn left into Main Road, and bear left into Staniforth Road. Turn left into Ribston Road, and continue into Bridge Road. Cross the railway bridge, and a broad path leads from the left-hand side to the shed.
Walking time 15 minutes.
See also under Sheffield.
Popup Maps (New Window) Street Map (1:25,000)
Town Map (1:50,000)
Road Map (1:100,000)
Road Map (1:200,000)
County Map (1:500,000)
Regional Map (1:1,000,000)
Chronology
DateEvent
11/04/1943Depot opened
11/04/1943Change of code to SHF
01/02/1950Change of code to 39B
01/06/1955Change of code to 41A
17/06/1963Closed to steam locomotives
01/04/1964Change of code to 41B
04/10/1965Depot closed
06/05/1973Change of code to DA