Menu
Quick Search
Enter locomotive number in the box below and press 'Go'!
In Touch
Donations
Counter
Visitor Statistics
|
» 16 Online
» 1462 Today
» 5784 Yesterday
» 7246 Week
» 28635 Month
» 148162 Year
» 3175015 Total
|
Record: 10235 (26/09/2023)
(Free MySQL Counter)
|
Depot: Devons Road (Bow)
Depot Details
Depot Name |
Devons Road (Bow) |
Depot Codes |
Code | From | To | 13B | 1882 | 09/06/1950 | 1D | 10/06/1950 | 09/09/1963 | 1J | 09/09/1963 | 10/02/1964 |
|
Date Opened |
1882 |
Date Closed |
10/02/1964 |
Pre Grouping Company |
NLR |
Big 4 Company |
LMS |
British Railways Region |
LMR |
Information |
|
1947 Directions |
The shed is on the east side of the Bow-Poplar line south of Bow
Station. The yard is visible from the line.
Turn left outside Bromley (by Bow) L.P.T.B. Station along St.
Leonards Street. Turn right into Devas Street, and at the end of this
street left into Brickfields Road. The shed entrance is a gate on the right
hand side by the end of this road. Walking time 10 minutes.
This area was heavily blitzed during the war, and some of the streets
are not too easy to identify, but the coal stage is visible from St. Leonards
Street. |
Popup Maps (New Window) |
25 Inch (1892-1914) OS (1:25,000) (1937-1961) OS 7th Series 1 inch (1:63,360) |
Chronology |
Date | Event | 1882 | Depot opened | 1882 | Change of code to 13B | 10/06/1950 | Change of code to 1D | 25/08/1958 | Closed to steam locomotives | 09/09/1963 | Change of code to 1J | 10/02/1964 | Depot closed |
|
|
|