Menu

Quick Search

Enter locomotive number in the box below and press 'Go'!

Content is coming here as you probably can see. Content is coming here as you probably can see.


?

In Touch

Bookmark and Share

Follow BRDatabase on Twitter

Advertising



Counter

Ad Visitor Statistics
» 6 Online
» 16 Today
» 772 Yesterday
» 3438 Week
» 15216 Month
» 304608 Year
» 815710 Total
Record: 1668 (12/02/2017)
(Free MySQL Counter)

Depot: Ebbw Junction (Newport)


Depot Details
Depot Name Ebbw Junction (Newport)
Depot Codes
CodeFromTo
76187531/01/1946
NPT 01/07/191531/01/1950
86A01/02/195031/08/1963
86B01/09/196305/05/1973
EJ06/05/1973
Date Opened 07/1915
Date Closed 10/1965
Big 4 Company GWR
British Railways Region WR
GWR Division NEWPORT
1947 Directions The shed is on the north side of the main line about a mile west of Newport Station. The top of the yard is visible from the line.
Bear left across the yard on leaving Newport Station, and turn right into High Street. Fork left into Commercial Street, and turn right into Cardiff Road. After about ¾ mile, turn left into a drive just past the second railway overbridge. This drive leads to the shed.
Walking time 45 minutes.
A bus service labelled Tredegar Park operates between the town and the shed drive.
Popup Maps (New Window) Street Map (1:25,000)
Town Map (1:50,000)
Road Map (1:100,000)
Road Map (1:200,000)
County Map (1:500,000)
Regional Map (1:1,000,000)
Chronology
DateEvent
1875Change of code to 76
07/1915Depot opened
01/07/1915Change of code to NPT
01/02/1950Change of code to 86A
01/09/1963Change of code to 86B
10/1965Depot closed
06/05/1973Change of code to EJ