Menu
Quick Search
Enter locomotive number in the box below and press 'Go'!
In Touch
Donations
Counter
Visitor Statistics
|
» 16 Online
» 722 Today
» 4163 Yesterday
» 14128 Week
» 67144 Month
» 186671 Year
» 3213524 Total
|
Record: 10235 (26/09/2023)
(Free MySQL Counter)
|
Depot: Exmouth Junction
Depot Details
Depot Name |
Exmouth Junction |
Depot Codes |
Code | From | To | EXJ | 1875 | 31/01/1950 | 72A | 01/02/1950 | 09/09/1963 | 83D | 09/09/1963 | 28/02/1967 |
|
Big 4 Company |
SR |
1947 Directions |
The shed is on the north side of the main line just east of the
junction of the Exmouth line. The yard is visible from the main line.
Turn right outside Polsloe Bridge Halt along the main road (A30).
Turn left along Beacon Lane, and then after going under the railway
bridge, left along a cinder path that runs parallel to the railway. At
the end of this path turn right along a similar path. The shed entrance
is on the left hand side a few yards further on. Walking time 5 minutes.
A bus route operates from Exeter St. David’s Station past Exeter
Central Station to the Guildhall, and a further service operates from
there to the end of Beacon Lane. |
Popup Maps (New Window) |
25 Inch (1892-1914) OS (1:25,000) (1937-1961) OS 7th Series 1 inch (1:63,360) |
Chronology |
Date | Event | 1875 | Change of code to EXJ | 01/02/1950 | Change of code to 72A | 09/09/1963 | Change of code to 83D |
|
|
|