Menu

Quick Search

Enter locomotive number in the box below and press 'Go'!

Content is coming here as you probably can see. Content is coming here as you probably can see.


?

In Touch

Bookmark and Share

Follow BRDatabase on Twitter

Advertising



Counter

Ad Visitor Statistics
» 12 Online
» 392 Today
» 1270 Yesterday
» 6755 Week
» 9337 Month
» 273970 Year
» 1495535 Total
Record: 1668 (12/02/2017)
(Free MySQL Counter)

Depot: Fleetwood


Depot Details
Depot Name Fleetwood
Depot Codes
CodeFromTo
24F187531/05/1950
28B01/02/195031/03/1952
24F01/04/195231/08/1963
10C01/09/196314/02/1966
Date Opened 1883
Date Closed 14/02/1966
Pre Grouping Company LNWR
Big 4 Company LMS
British Railways Region LMR
Information Closed when Blackpool North was reopened.
1947 Directions The shed is on the west side of the line about a mile south of the station. The yard is partially visible from the line.

Turn left outside the station along Queen’s Terrace, and continue into Dock Street. Turn right into Station Road and left into Radcliffe Road. The shed entrance is on the left hand side some distance further on (almost opposite Heathfield Road). Walking time 25 minutes.

A tram service labelled Blackpool runs from Queen’s Terrace to the shed entrance.
Popup Maps (New Window) Street Map (1:25,000)
Town Map (1:50,000)
Road Map (1:100,000)
Road Map (1:200,000)
County Map (1:500,000)
Regional Map (1:1,000,000)
Chronology
DateEvent
1875Change of code to 24F
1883Depot opened
01/02/1950Change of code to 28B
01/04/1952Change of code to 24F
01/09/1963Change of code to 10C
14/02/1966Depot closed