Menu
Quick Search
Enter locomotive number in the box below and press 'Go'!
In Touch
Donations
Counter
Visitor Statistics
|
» 12 Online
» 800 Today
» 5784 Yesterday
» 6584 Week
» 27973 Month
» 147500 Year
» 3174353 Total
|
Record: 10235 (26/09/2023)
(Free MySQL Counter)
|
Depot: Frodingham
Depot Details
Depot Name |
Frodingham |
Depot Codes |
Code | From | To | FRO | 1875 | 31/01/1950 | 36C | 01/02/1950 | 05/05/1973 | FH | 06/05/1973 | |
|
Big 4 Company |
LNER |
1947 Directions |
The shed is on the north side of the line east of the station. The
yard is partially visible from the line.
Turn right outside Scunthorpe and Frodingham Station into
Station Road. Turn third left into Cole Street, proceed to the junction
with High Street (traffic lights) and turn right there. Continue along
High Street until St. John’s Church is reached on the right. Immediately
beyond the church Dawes Lane will be seen diverting to the left.
Proceed along Dawes Lane, and the shed entrance is on the right, about
100 yards beyond the railway crossing. Walking time 25 minutes.
|
Popup Maps (New Window) |
25 Inch (1892-1914) OS (1:25,000) (1937-1961) OS 7th Series 1 inch (1:63,360) |
Chronology |
Date | Event | 1875 | Change of code to FRO | 01/02/1950 | Change of code to 36C | 06/05/1973 | Change of code to FH |
|
|
|