Menu
Quick Search
Enter locomotive number in the box below and press 'Go'!
In Touch
Donations
Counter
Visitor Statistics
|
» 24 Online
» 237 Today
» 5784 Yesterday
» 6021 Week
» 27410 Month
» 146937 Year
» 3173790 Total
|
Record: 10235 (26/09/2023)
(Free MySQL Counter)
|
Depot: Guildford
Depot Details
Depot Name |
Guildford |
Depot Codes |
Code | From | To | GFD | 1875 | 31/01/1950 | 70C | 01/02/1950 | 30/06/1967 |
|
Date Closed |
09/07/1967 |
Big 4 Company |
SR |
1947 Directions |
The shed is on the west side of the line south of the station. The
yard is visible from the line.
Turn right outside the station, and then first right into Farnham
Road. The shed entrance is on the left hand side just past the railway
underbridge. Walking time 5 minutes.
Note.-The shed yard extends under the road bridge, and there
are live rails in the vicinity of the yard. |
Popup Maps (New Window) |
25 Inch (1892-1914) OS (1:25,000) (1937-1961) OS 7th Series 1 inch (1:63,360) |
Chronology |
Date | Event | 1875 | Change of code to GFD | 01/02/1950 | Change of code to 70C | 09/07/1967 | Depot closed |
|
|
|