Menu

Quick Search

Enter locomotive number in the box below and press 'Go'!

Content is coming here as you probably can see. Content is coming here as you probably can see.


?

In Touch

Bookmark and Share

Follow BRDatabase on Twitter

Advertising



Counter

Ad Visitor Statistics
» 17 Online
» 711 Today
» 863 Yesterday
» 2435 Week
» 12570 Month
» 328801 Year
» 839903 Total
Record: 1668 (12/02/2017)
(Free MySQL Counter)

Depot: Holbeck (MR)


Depot Details
Depot Name Holbeck (MR)
Depot Codes
CodeFromTo
28187531/12/1922
M2801/01/192331/01/1935
20A01/02/193531/01/1957
55A01/02/195705/05/1973
HO06/05/1973
Date Opened 09/05/1868
Pre Grouping Company MR
Big 4 Company LMS
British Railways Region ER
1947 Directions The shed is on the west side of the line between Leeds City and Hunslet Stations. The yard is partially visible from the line.

From Leeds City Station.
Turn sharp right outside the station into Bishopgate. Turn right into Neville Street, and continue into Victoria Road. Turn right into Manor Road, and left at the end into Marshall Street. Turn right at the end into Nineveh Road, and the shed entrance is on the right just past the railway under-bridge. Walking time 20 minutes.

From Leeds Central Station.
Turn sharp right outside the station into Whitehall Road. Turn left into Springwell Road, and right at the end into Water Lane. Bear left 7 into Bridge Road, left again into Nineveh Road, and the shed entrance is on the left. Walking time 20 minutes. See also under Leeds.
Popup Maps (New Window) Street Map (1:25,000)
Town Map (1:50,000)
Road Map (1:100,000)
Road Map (1:200,000)
County Map (1:500,000)
Regional Map (1:1,000,000)
Chronology
DateEvent
09/05/1868Depot opened
1875Change of code to 28
01/01/1923Change of code to M28
01/01/1935Change of code to 20A
01/02/1957Change of code to 55A
02/10/1967Closed to steam locomotives
06/05/1973Change of code to HO