Menu

Quick Search

Enter locomotive number in the box below and press 'Go'!

Content is coming here as you probably can see. Content is coming here as you probably can see.


?

In Touch

Bookmark and Share

Follow BRDatabase on Twitter

Advertising



Counter

Ad Visitor Statistics
» 8 Online
» 708 Today
» 947 Yesterday
» 1655 Week
» 20437 Month
» 268730 Year
» 1153111 Total
Record: 1668 (12/02/2017)
(Free MySQL Counter)

Depot: Kettering


Depot Details
Depot Name Kettering
Depot Codes
CodeFromTo
12187531/12/1922
M1201/01/192331/01/1935
15B01/02/193531/08/1963
15C01/09/196314/06/1965
Date Opened 1866
Date Closed 14/06/1965
Pre Grouping Company MR
Big 4 Company LMS
British Railways Region LMR
1947 Directions The shed is on the east side of the line north of the station. The yard is visible from the line.

Turn left outside the station into Midland Road. The shed entrance is on the left hand side 50 yards from the station. Walking time less than 5 minutes.
Popup Maps (New Window) Street Map (1:25,000)
Town Map (1:50,000)
Road Map (1:100,000)
Road Map (1:200,000)
County Map (1:500,000)
Regional Map (1:1,000,000)
Chronology
DateEvent
1866Depot opened
1875Change of code to 12
01/01/1923Change of code to M12
01/01/1935Change of code to 15B
01/09/1963Change of code to 15C
14/06/1965Depot closed