Menu

Quick Search

Enter locomotive number in the box below and press 'Go'!

Content is coming here as you probably can see. Content is coming here as you probably can see.


?

In Touch

Bookmark and Share

Follow BRDatabase on Twitter

Advertising



Counter

Ad Visitor Statistics
» 10 Online
» 245 Today
» 1018 Yesterday
» 5417 Week
» 16988 Month
» 265281 Year
» 1149662 Total
Record: 1668 (12/02/2017)
(Free MySQL Counter)

Depot: Langwith Junction


Depot Details
Depot Name Langwith Junction
Depot Codes
CodeFromTo
LNG187531/01/1950
40E01/02/195030/06/1958
41J01/07/195808/02/1966
Date Opened 16/11/1896
Date Closed 06/02/1966
Pre Grouping Company LDECR
Big 4 Company LNER
British Railways Region ER
1947 Directions The shed is on the west side of the Sutton-in-Ashfield line south of Shirebrook North Station. There is no passenger service on this line, but the yard is partially visible from the Mansfield line.

From Shirebrook North Station. L.N.E.R.
Leave the station by the footbridge at the south end, turning right across a piece of waste land, and turn left into Burlington Avenue, changing almost immediately into Langwith Road. Continue for about 200 yards, and turn left into Eland Road. The shed entrance is at the end of this cul-de-sac.
Walking time 5 minutes.

From Shirebrook Station. L.M.S.
Turn left outside Shirebrook Station, and continue for about 150 yards. Turn right along the Langwith Road, and continue for almost ½ mile. Turn right into Eland Road, and the shed entrance is at the end of this short cul-de-sac.
Walking time 20 minutes.
Popup Maps (New Window) Street Map (1:25,000)
Town Map (1:50,000)
Road Map (1:100,000)
Road Map (1:200,000)
County Map (1:500,000)
Regional Map (1:1,000,000)
Chronology
DateEvent
1875Change of code to LNG
16/11/1896Depot opened
01/02/1950Change of code to 40E
01/07/1958Change of code to 41J
06/02/1966Depot closed