Menu

Quick Search

Enter locomotive number in the box below and press 'Go'!

Content is coming here as you probably can see. Content is coming here as you probably can see.


?

In Touch

Bookmark and Share

Follow BRDatabase on Twitter

Advertising



Counter

Ad Visitor Statistics
» 5 Online
» 711 Today
» 862 Yesterday
» 4259 Week
» 5149 Month
» 313130 Year
» 1197511 Total
Record: 1668 (12/02/2017)
(Free MySQL Counter)

Depot: Leicester Midland


Depot Details
Depot Name Leicester Midland
Depot Codes
CodeFromTo
10187531/12/1922
M1001/01/192331/01/1935
15C01/02/193531/08/1963
15A01/09/196331/05/1966
LR06/05/1973
Date Opened 05/07/1840
Pre Grouping Company MR
Big 4 Company LMS
British Railways Region LMR
1947 Directions The shed is on the east side of the main line north of the station. The yard is visible from the line.

Turn left outside Leicester London Road Station into London Road, and first left into Conduit Street. Turn right at the end into Sparkenhoe Street, and left almost immediately into Upper Conduit Street. Fork left into Upper Kent Street, and turn left into Beal Street. The shed entrance is on the left hand side, by the end of this road. Walking time 15 minutes.
Popup Maps (New Window) Street Map (1:25,000)
Town Map (1:50,000)
Road Map (1:100,000)
Road Map (1:200,000)
County Map (1:500,000)
Regional Map (1:1,000,000)
Chronology
DateEvent
05/07/1840Depot opened
1875Change of code to 10
01/01/1923Change of code to M10
01/01/1935Change of code to 15C
01/09/1963Change of code to 15A
13/06/1965Closed to steam locomotives
06/05/1973Change of code to LR