Menu

Quick Search

Enter locomotive number in the box below and press 'Go'!

Content is coming here as you probably can see. Content is coming here as you probably can see.


?

In Touch

Bookmark and Share

Follow BRDatabase on Twitter

Advertising



Counter

Ad Visitor Statistics
» 5 Online
» 134 Today
» 1048 Yesterday
» 2119 Week
» 9303 Month
» 317284 Year
» 1201665 Total
Record: 1668 (12/02/2017)
(Free MySQL Counter)

Depot: Longsight


Depot Details
Depot Name Longsight
Depot Codes
CodeFromTo
1601/01/187531/12/1922
W1601/01/192331/01/1935
9A01/02/193505/05/1973
LO06/05/1973
Big 4 Company LMS
1947 Directions The shed is on the east side of the line, north of the station. The yard is partially visible from the line.

Turn left outside the station into Kirkmanshulme Lane. Fork left into The Aven and turn left into Redgate Lane. A cinder path leads to the shed from the left hand side of this lane. Walking time 5 minutes
Popup Maps (New Window) Street Map (1:25,000)
Town Map (1:50,000)
Road Map (1:100,000)
Road Map (1:200,000)
County Map (1:500,000)
Regional Map (1:1,000,000)
Chronology
DateEvent
1875Change of code to 16
01/01/1923Change of code to W16
01/01/1935Change of code to 9A
14/02/1965Closed to steam locomotives
06/05/1973Change of code to LO