Menu
Quick Search
Enter locomotive number in the box below and press 'Go'!
In Touch
Donations
Counter
Visitor Statistics
|
» 17 Online
» 1409 Today
» 5784 Yesterday
» 7193 Week
» 28582 Month
» 148109 Year
» 3174962 Total
|
Record: 10235 (26/09/2023)
(Free MySQL Counter)
|
Depot: Low Moor
Depot Details
Depot Name |
Low Moor |
Depot Codes |
Code | From | To | 25F | 1875 | 31/08/1956 | 56F | 01/09/1956 | 31/07/1967 | 55J | 01/08/1967 | 31/08/1967 |
|
Pre Grouping Company |
LYR |
Big 4 Company |
LMS |
British Railways Region |
LMR |
Information |
Low Moor served Bradford Exchange (the southernmost of the main terminii in Bradford) on the L&Y routes to Burnley and Manchester via Halifax on the one hand, and to Barnsley and Wakefield on the other. The depot briefly became LNWR/LYR joint in 1922 but then the whole became LMS with the grouping of 1923. |
1947 Directions |
The shed is on the north side of Low Moor Station. The yard is
visible from the line.
Turn right outside the station into Cleckheaton Road, and almost
immediately turn right into Lockwood Street. Continue along a cinder
path, and the shed entrance is on the right hand side. Walking time
less than 5 minutes. |
Popup Maps (New Window) |
25 Inch (1892-1914) OS (1:25,000) (1937-1961) OS 7th Series 1 inch (1:63,360) |
Chronology |
Date | Event | 1875 | Change of code to 25F | 01/09/1956 | Change of code to 56F | 01/08/1967 | Change of code to 55J |
|
|
|