Menu

Quick Search

Enter locomotive number in the box below and press 'Go'!

Content is coming here as you probably can see. Content is coming here as you probably can see.


?

In Touch

Bookmark and Share

Follow BRDatabase on Twitter

Advertising



Counter

Ad Visitor Statistics
» 1 Online
» 110 Today
» 1296 Yesterday
» 5218 Week
» 34716 Month
» 371562 Year
» 1593127 Total
Record: 1668 (12/02/2017)
(Free MySQL Counter)

Depot: Machynlleth


Depot Details
Depot Name Machynlleth
Depot Codes
CodeFromTo
MCH187531/01/1950
89C01/02/195031/08/1963
6F01/09/196312/12/1966
MN06/05/1973
Date Opened 03/01/1863
Pre Grouping Company GWR
Big 4 Company GWR
British Railways Region LMR
GWR Division CENTRAL WALES
Information Originally built by the Newtown and Machynlleth Railway in 1880
1947 Directions The shed is on the south side of the line east of the station. The yard is visible from the line.

A path leads from the east end of the station yard to the shed. Walking time less than 5 minutes.
Popup Maps (New Window) 25 Inch (1892-1914)
OS (1:25,000) (1937-1961)
OS 7th Series 1 inch (1:63,360)
Chronology
DateEvent
03/01/1863Depot opened
1875Change of code to MCH
01/02/1950Change of code to 89C
01/09/1963Change of code to 6F
05/12/1966Closed to steam locomotives
06/05/1973Change of code to MN