Menu

Quick Search

Enter locomotive number in the box below and press 'Go'!

Content is coming here as you probably can see. Content is coming here as you probably can see.


?

In Touch

Bookmark and Share

Follow BRDatabase on Twitter

Advertising



Counter

Ad Visitor Statistics
» 17 Online
» 711 Today
» 863 Yesterday
» 2435 Week
» 12570 Month
» 328801 Year
» 839903 Total
Record: 1668 (12/02/2017)
(Free MySQL Counter)

Depot: Manningham


Depot Details
Depot Name Manningham
Depot Codes
CodeFromTo
29187531/12/1922
M2901/01/192331/01/1935
20E01/02/193531/01/1957
55F01/02/195731/03/1967
Date Opened 1872
Date Closed 30/04/1967
Pre Grouping Company MR
Big 4 Company LMS
British Railways Region LMR
1947 Directions The shed is at the east side of the station. The yard is visible from the line.

A path leads from the north end of the down platform to the shed. There is also an entrance in Queens Road which runs over the south end of the station.
Popup Maps (New Window) Street Map (1:25,000)
Town Map (1:50,000)
Road Map (1:100,000)
Road Map (1:200,000)
County Map (1:500,000)
Regional Map (1:1,000,000)
Chronology
DateEvent
1872Depot opened
1875Change of code to 29
01/01/1923Change of code to M29
01/01/1935Change of code to 20E
01/02/1957Change of code to 55F
30/04/1967Depot closed