Menu

Quick Search

Enter locomotive number in the box below and press 'Go'!

Content is coming here as you probably can see. Content is coming here as you probably can see.


?

In Touch

Bookmark and Share

Follow BRDatabase on Twitter

Advertising



Counter

Ad Visitor Statistics
» 10 Online
» 245 Today
» 1018 Yesterday
» 5417 Week
» 16988 Month
» 265281 Year
» 1149662 Total
Record: 1668 (12/02/2017)
(Free MySQL Counter)

Depot: Mexborough


Depot Details
Depot Name Mexborough
Depot Codes
CodeFromTo
MEX187531/01/1950
36B01/02/195030/03/1958
41F31/03/195829/02/1964
Date Closed 02/03/1964
Big 4 Company LNER
1947 Directions The shed is on the south side of the line west of the station. The yard is visible from the line.
Turn right outside the station along a rough cinder path. After about 20 yards turn right under the railway bridge, and right again along a path running parallel to the railway. This leads to the shed.
Walking time 5 minutes.
Popup Maps (New Window) Street Map (1:25,000)
Town Map (1:50,000)
Road Map (1:100,000)
Road Map (1:200,000)
County Map (1:500,000)
Regional Map (1:1,000,000)
Chronology
DateEvent
1875Change of code to MEX
01/02/1950Change of code to 36B
31/03/1958Change of code to 41F
09/09/1963Closed to steam locomotives
02/03/1964Depot closed