Menu

Quick Search

Enter locomotive number in the box below and press 'Go'!

Content is coming here as you probably can see. Content is coming here as you probably can see.


?

In Touch

Bookmark and Share

Follow BRDatabase on Twitter

Advertising



Counter

Ad Visitor Statistics
» 5 Online
» 90 Today
» 1085 Yesterday
» 6146 Week
» 20723 Month
» 383968 Year
» 460555 Total
Record: 1668 (12/02/2017)
(Free MySQL Counter)

Depot: Neville Hill


Depot Details
Depot Name Neville Hill
Depot Codes
CodeFromTo
NEV187531/01/1950
50B01/02/195031/12/1959
55H01/01/196005/05/1973
NL06/05/1973
Date Opened 10/1894
Pre Grouping Company NER
Big 4 Company LNER
British Railways Region ER
1947 Directions The shed is on the north side of the line between Marsh Lane and Osmondthorpe. Stations. The yard is partially visible from the line.
Leave Osmondthorpe Station by the northern exit, and turn left into Rookwood Road. Turn left into Osmondthorpe Lane, and the shed entrance is on the right-hand side.
Walking time 15 minutes.
Popup Maps (New Window) Street Map (1:25,000)
Town Map (1:50,000)
Road Map (1:100,000)
Road Map (1:200,000)
County Map (1:500,000)
Regional Map (1:1,000,000)
Chronology
DateEvent
1875Change of code to NEV
10/1894Depot opened
01/02/1950Change of code to 50B
01/01/1960Change of code to 55H
12/06/1966Closed to steam locomotives
06/05/1973Change of code to NL