Menu
Quick Search
Enter locomotive number in the box below and press 'Go'!
In Touch
Donations
Counter
Visitor Statistics
|
» 19 Online
» 1524 Today
» 5784 Yesterday
» 7308 Week
» 28697 Month
» 148224 Year
» 3175077 Total
|
Record: 10235 (26/09/2023)
(Free MySQL Counter)
|
Depot: Newton Abbot
Depot Details
Depot Name |
Newton Abbot |
Depot Codes |
Code | From | To | NA (133) | 1875 | 31/01/1950 | 83A | 01/02/1950 | 05/05/1973 | NA | 06/05/1973 | |
|
Big 4 Company |
GWR |
GWR Division |
NEWTON ABBOT |
1947 Directions |
The shed is at the east side of the station. The yard is visible from
the line.
Turn left outside the station into Station Road, and continue along
Torquay Road. Turn first left after crossing the railway bridge. The
shed entrance is on the left hand side of this road. Walking time
5 minutes.
Note.-The works are at the back of the shed. The entrance is
further along the road. |
Popup Maps (New Window) |
25 Inch (1892-1914) OS (1:25,000) (1937-1961) OS 7th Series 1 inch (1:63,360) |
Chronology |
Date | Event | 1875 | Change of code to 133 | 1875 | Change of code to NA | 01/02/1950 | Change of code to 83A | 06/05/1973 | Change of code to NA |
|
|
|