Menu

Quick Search

Enter locomotive number in the box below and press 'Go'!

Content is coming here as you probably can see. Content is coming here as you probably can see.


?

In Touch

Bookmark and Share

Follow BRDatabase on Twitter

Advertising



Counter

Ad Visitor Statistics
» 15 Online
» 776 Today
» 1015 Yesterday
» 4944 Week
» 20058 Month
» 323248 Year
» 1544813 Total
Record: 1668 (12/02/2017)
(Free MySQL Counter)

Depot: Northwich


Depot Details
Depot Name Northwich
Depot Codes
CodeFromTo
NTH187531/01/1950
13D01/02/193521/05/1950
39J01/02/195021/05/1950
9G22/05/195031/03/1958
8E01/04/195829/02/1968
Date Closed 04/03/1968
Big 4 Company LMS
Information Merged with NER shed NTH
1947 Directions The shed is at the east side of the station. The yard is visible from the line.
Go straight ahead outside the station along the approach road. Turn sharp left into Middlewich Road, and cross the railway bridge. The shed entrance is on the left, just past the railway bridge.
Walking time 5 minutes.
Popup Maps (New Window) Street Map (1:25,000)
Town Map (1:50,000)
Road Map (1:100,000)
Road Map (1:200,000)
County Map (1:500,000)
Regional Map (1:1,000,000)
Chronology
DateEvent
1875Change of code to NTH
01/01/1935Change of code to 13D
01/02/1950Change of code to 39J
01/05/1950Change of code to 9G
01/04/1958Change of code to 8E
04/03/1968Depot closed