Menu

Quick Search

Enter locomotive number in the box below and press 'Go'!

Content is coming here as you probably can see. Content is coming here as you probably can see.


?

In Touch

Bookmark and Share

Follow BRDatabase on Twitter

Advertising



Counter

Ad Visitor Statistics
» 22 Online
» 1001 Today
» 948 Yesterday
» 7121 Week
» 18692 Month
» 266985 Year
» 1151366 Total
Record: 1668 (12/02/2017)
(Free MySQL Counter)

Depot: Norwich Thorpe


Depot Details
Depot Name Norwich Thorpe
Depot Codes
CodeFromTo
NOR187531/01/1950
32A01/02/195005/05/1973
NO06/05/197301/09/1973
NR02/09/197330/11/1983
NC01/12/1983
Date Opened 30/04/1844
Date Closed 1990
Pre Grouping Company YNR
Big 4 Company LNER
British Railways Region ER
1947 Directions The shed is on the south side of the line east of the station. The yard is visible from the line.
Go up the short slope from Norwich Thorpe Station yard to Lower Clarence Road, Continue along this road, and turn first right into Clarence Road. The shed entrance is on the right hand side just past the railway under-bridge.
Walking time 10 minutes.
Note: This shed is very dispersed.
Popup Maps (New Window) Street Map (1:25,000)
Town Map (1:50,000)
Road Map (1:100,000)
Road Map (1:200,000)
County Map (1:500,000)
Regional Map (1:1,000,000)
Chronology
DateEvent
30/04/1844Depot opened
1875Change of code to NOR
01/02/1950Change of code to 32A
02/04/1962Closed to steam locomotives
06/05/1973Change of code to NO
02/09/1973Change of code to NR
01/12/1983Change of code to NC
1990Depot closed