Menu

Quick Search

Enter locomotive number in the box below and press 'Go'!

Content is coming here as you probably can see. Content is coming here as you probably can see.


?

In Touch

Bookmark and Share

Follow BRDatabase on Twitter

Advertising



Counter

Ad Visitor Statistics
» 5 Online
» 112 Today
» 950 Yesterday
» 112 Week
» 7296 Month
» 315277 Year
» 1199658 Total
Record: 1668 (12/02/2017)
(Free MySQL Counter)

Depot: Nottingham


Depot Details
Depot Name Nottingham
Depot Codes
CodeFromTo
18186831/12/1922
M1801/01/192331/01/1935
16A01/02/193531/08/1963
16D01/09/196330/11/1967
NM06/05/1973
Date Opened 1868
Date Closed 11/1967
Pre Grouping Company MR
Big 4 Company LMS
British Railways Region LMR
1947 Directions The shed is on the south side of the line west of the station. The yard is visible from the line.

Turn left outside Nottingham L.M.S. Station along Carrington Street. Turn right almost immediately along Queens Walk. Turn right along Waterway Street West, and left at the end into Wilford Road. Turn right a few yards further on into Middle Furlong Road. The shed entrance is a gate on the right hand side (past the shed buildings). Walking time 15 minutes.
Popup Maps (New Window) Street Map (1:25,000)
Town Map (1:50,000)
Road Map (1:100,000)
Road Map (1:200,000)
County Map (1:500,000)
Regional Map (1:1,000,000)
Chronology
DateEvent
1868Depot opened
1868Change of code to 18
01/01/1923Change of code to M18
01/01/1935Change of code to 16A
01/09/1963Change of code to 16D
04/04/1965Closed to steam locomotives
11/1967Depot closed
06/05/1973Change of code to NM