Menu

Quick Search

Enter locomotive number in the box below and press 'Go'!

Content is coming here as you probably can see. Content is coming here as you probably can see.


?

In Touch

Bookmark and Share

Follow BRDatabase on Twitter

Advertising



Counter

Ad Visitor Statistics
» 16 Online
» 1317 Today
» 1371 Yesterday
» 5277 Week
» 34863 Month
» 408876 Year
» 1630441 Total
Record: 1668 (12/02/2017)
(Free MySQL Counter)

Depot: Nuneaton


Depot Details
Depot Name Nuneaton
Depot Codes
CodeFromTo
401/01/189031/12/1922
W401/01/192331/01/1935
2D01/02/193530/06/1950
2B01/07/195031/08/1963
5E01/09/196331/05/1966
Date Opened 13/07/1847
Date Closed 06/06/1966
Pre Grouping Company LNWR
Big 4 Company LMS
British Railways Region LMR
1947 Directions The shed is in the fork of the main and Coventry lines south of the station. The yard is visible from both lines.

Leave Nuneaton Trent Valley Station by the west exit into Broad Street. Turn left almost immediately into Regent Street. and left into Wheat Street. Just before the railway bridge, a cinder path leads from the right hand side of this road, along the back of a row of houses to the shed. Walking time 10 minutes.
Popup Maps (New Window) 25 Inch (1892-1914)
OS (1:25,000) (1937-1961)
OS 7th Series 1 inch (1:63,360)
Chronology
DateEvent
13/07/1847Depot opened
1875Change of code to 2D
01/07/1950Change of code to 2B
01/09/1963Change of code to 5E
06/06/1966Depot closed