Menu

Quick Search

Enter locomotive number in the box below and press 'Go'!

Content is coming here as you probably can see. Content is coming here as you probably can see.


?

In Touch

Bookmark and Share

Follow BRDatabase on Twitter

Advertising



Counter

Ad Visitor Statistics
» 13 Online
» 414 Today
» 960 Yesterday
» 4235 Week
» 21571 Month
» 299367 Year
» 1183748 Total
Record: 1668 (12/02/2017)
(Free MySQL Counter)

Depot: Old Oak Common


Depot Details
Depot Name Old Oak Common
Depot Codes
CodeFromTo
101187531/01/1946
PDN187531/01/1950
81A01/02/195005/05/1973
OC06/05/1973
Date Opened 17/03/1906
Pre Grouping Company GWR
Big 4 Company GWR
British Railways Region WR
GWR Division LONDON
1947 Directions The shed is on the north side of the line east of Old Oak Lane Halt. The yard is not visible from the line.
Turn left outside Willesden (L.M.S. & L.P.T.B.) Station along Old Oak Lane, and turn left again into Old Oak Common Lane. A cinder path leads to the shed from a gate on the left hand side.
Walking time 10 minutes.
Popup Maps (New Window) Street Map (1:25,000)
Town Map (1:50,000)
Road Map (1:100,000)
Road Map (1:200,000)
County Map (1:500,000)
Regional Map (1:1,000,000)
Chronology
DateEvent
1875Change of code to 101
1875Change of code to PDN
17/03/1906Depot opened
01/02/1950Change of code to 81A
22/03/1965Closed to steam locomotives
06/05/1973Change of code to OC