Menu

Quick Search

Enter locomotive number in the box below and press 'Go'!

Content is coming here as you probably can see. Content is coming here as you probably can see.


?

In Touch

Bookmark and Share

Follow BRDatabase on Twitter

Advertising



Counter

Ad Visitor Statistics
» 8 Online
» 103 Today
» 1086 Yesterday
» 103 Week
» 21005 Month
» 21005 Year
» 1242570 Total
Record: 1668 (12/02/2017)
(Free MySQL Counter)

Depot: Oswestry


Depot Details
Depot Name Oswestry
Depot Codes
CodeFromTo
129187531/01/1946
OSW187531/01/1950
89A01/02/195009/09/1960
89D10/09/196031/08/1963
6E01/09/196318/01/1965
Date Closed 18/01/1965
Big 4 Company GWR
GWR Division CENTRAL WALES
1947 Directions The shed is in the fork of the Gobowen and Whitchurch lines east of the station. The yard is visible from both lines.

Turn right outside the station‘, and left along the side of the goods yard. Turn right into Beatrice Street, and continue into Gobowen Road. Fork right into Whittington Ro‘ad, go under the railway bridge, and the shed entrance is on the right hand side of this lane. Walking time 15 minutes.

Note.-The works are on the opposite side of the Whitchurch line to the shed, and are approached by means of a footbridge from the Gobowen Road.
Popup Maps (New Window) Street Map (1:25,000)
Town Map (1:50,000)
Road Map (1:100,000)
Road Map (1:200,000)
County Map (1:500,000)
Regional Map (1:1,000,000)
Chronology
DateEvent
1875Change of code to 129
1875Change of code to OSW
01/02/1950Change of code to 89A
10/09/1960Change of code to 89D
01/09/1963Change of code to 6E
18/01/1965Depot closed