Menu
Quick Search
Enter locomotive number in the box below and press 'Go'!
In Touch
Donations
Counter
Visitor Statistics
|
» 9 Online
» 737 Today
» 4469 Yesterday
» 14780 Week
» 79734 Month
» 282398 Year
» 3309251 Total
|
Record: 10235 (26/09/2023)
(Free MySQL Counter)
|
Depot: Patricroft
Depot Details
Depot Name |
Patricroft |
Depot Codes |
Code | From | To | 34 | 01/01/1885 | 31/12/1922 | W34 | 01/01/1923 | 31/01/1935 | 10C | 01/01/1923 | 31/01/1958 | 26F | 01/02/1958 | 31/08/1963 | 9H | 01/09/1963 | 01/07/1968 |
|
Big 4 Company |
LMS |
British Railways Region |
LMR |
1947 Directions |
The shed is in the triangle of the Eccles-Patricroft, Eccles-Monton
Green, and Patricroft-Bury lines. The yard is partially visible from the
lines.
Turn left outside Patricroft Station along a narrow road running
parallel to the railway, and continue into Hampden Grove. A foot bridge
leads from the left hand side of this road to the shed. Walking time 5
minutes.
Note.-The shed consists of two buildings in the form of a letter āLā. |
Popup Maps (New Window) |
25 Inch (1892-1914) OS (1:25,000) (1937-1961) OS 7th Series 1 inch (1:63,360) |
Chronology |
Date | Event | 1875 | Change of code to 10C | 01/02/1958 | Change of code to 26F | 01/09/1963 | Change of code to 9H |
|
|
|