Menu
Quick Search
Enter locomotive number in the box below and press 'Go'!
In Touch
Donations
Counter
Visitor Statistics
|
» 18 Online
» 1525 Today
» 4397 Yesterday
» 19328 Week
» 72344 Month
» 191871 Year
» 3218724 Total
|
Record: 10235 (26/09/2023)
(Free MySQL Counter)
|
Depot: Ramsgate
Depot Details
Depot Name |
Ramsgate |
Depot Codes |
Code | From | To | RAM | 1875 | 31/01/1950 | 74B | 01/02/1950 | 30/09/1958 | 73G | 01/10/1958 | 05/05/1973 | RM | 06/05/1973 | 30/11/1976 | RE | 01/12/1976 | 31/08/1999 | RM | 01/09/1999 | |
|
Big 4 Company |
SR |
1947 Directions |
The shed is on the north side of the line west of the station. The
yard is partially visible from the line.
Bear right from the station approach to Wilfred Road, and almost
immediately turn right along a cinder path oarallel to the railway. Turn
right into Newington Road at the end of the path. The shed entrance
is a gate on the right hand side just p at the railway underbridge.
Walking time 5 minutes. |
Popup Maps (New Window) |
25 Inch (1892-1914) OS (1:25,000) (1937-1961) OS 7th Series 1 inch (1:63,360) |
Chronology |
Date | Event | 1875 | Change of code to RAM | 01/02/1950 | Change of code to 74B | 01/10/1958 | Change of code to 73G | 06/05/1973 | Change of code to RM | 01/12/1976 | Change of code to RE | 01/09/1999 | Change of code to RM |
|
|
|