Menu
Quick Search
Enter locomotive number in the box below and press 'Go'!
In Touch
Donations
Counter
Visitor Statistics
|
» 23 Online
» 4781 Today
» 4469 Yesterday
» 18824 Week
» 83778 Month
» 286442 Year
» 3313295 Total
|
Record: 10235 (26/09/2023)
(Free MySQL Counter)
|
Depot: Reading (W.R.)
Depot Details
Depot Name |
Reading (W.R.) |
Depot Codes |
Code | From | To | RDG (121) | 1875 | 31/01/1950 | 81D | 01/02/1950 | 05/05/1973 | RG | 06/05/1973 | |
|
Pre Grouping Company |
GWR |
Big 4 Company |
GWR |
British Railways Region |
WR |
GWR Division |
LONDON |
1947 Directions |
The shed is in the fork of the Newbury and Didcot lines west of the station. The yard is visible from both lines.
Turn right outside Reading G.W. Station along Tudor Road. Turn left into Caversham Road, and right into Great Knollys Street. A cinderpath leads across a piece of waste land (opposite house No. 145) from the right hand side of this road to the shed. Walking time 10 minutes. |
Popup Maps (New Window) |
25 Inch (1892-1914) OS (1:25,000) (1937-1961) OS 7th Series 1 inch (1:63,360) |
Chronology |
Date | Event | 1875 | Change of code to 121 | 1875 | Change of code to RDG | 01/02/1950 | Change of code to 81D | 06/05/1973 | Change of code to RG |
|
|
|