Menu

Quick Search

Enter locomotive number in the box below and press 'Go'!

Content is coming here as you probably can see. Content is coming here as you probably can see.


?

In Touch

Bookmark and Share

Follow BRDatabase on Twitter

Advertising



Counter

Ad Visitor Statistics
» 22 Online
» 384 Today
» 1075 Yesterday
» 7096 Week
» 20200 Month
» 20200 Year
» 1241765 Total
Record: 1668 (12/02/2017)
(Free MySQL Counter)

Depot: Rhyl


Depot Details
Depot Name Rhyl
Depot Codes
CodeFromTo
38R04/189931/12/1922
W38R01/01/192331/01/1935
7D01/02/193529/02/1952
6K01/03/195211/02/1963
Date Closed 11/02/1963
Big 4 Company LMS
Popup Maps (New Window) Street Map (1:25,000)
Town Map (1:50,000)
Road Map (1:100,000)
Road Map (1:200,000)
County Map (1:500,000)
Regional Map (1:1,000,000)
Chronology
DateEvent
04/1899Change of code to 38R
01/01/1923Change of code to W38R
01/01/1935Change of code to 7D
01/03/1952Change of code to 6K
11/02/1963Depot closed