Menu

Quick Search

Enter locomotive number in the box below and press 'Go'!

Content is coming here as you probably can see. Content is coming here as you probably can see.


?

In Touch

Bookmark and Share

Follow BRDatabase on Twitter

Advertising



Counter

Ad Visitor Statistics
» 23 Online
» 591 Today
» 1024 Yesterday
» 6568 Week
» 22766 Month
» 187666 Year
» 698768 Total
Record: 1668 (12/02/2017)
(Free MySQL Counter)

Depot: Shrewsbury


Depot Details
Depot Name Shrewsbury
Depot Codes
CodeFromTo
134187531/01/1946
SALOP187531/01/1950
3001/01/187531/12/1922
W3001/01/192331/01/1935
4A01/02/193531/12/1948
84G01/02/195009/09/1960
89A10/09/196031/08/1963
6D01/09/196313/07/1971
Date Closed 13/07/1971
Pre Grouping Company LNWR/GWR
Big 4 Company LMS/GWR
British Railways Region LMR
GWR Division WOLVERHAMPTON
Information Joint LMS/GWR shed - sheds wee adjoining.
1947 Directions The shed is on the east side of the Shrewsbury-Hereford line south of the station. The yard is visible from this line.

Turn left out of the station yard along Castle Gates, and continue into Castle Street. Turn left into St. Marys Street, continue along Dogpole and turn left into Wyle Cop. Cross English Bridge, and turn right along Coleham Head. Fork left along Betton Street, and turn left along Scott Street (over the railway bridge). The shed entrance is the first door on the left hand side. Walking time 25 minutes

Note.-The G.W.R. shed is next door.
Popup Maps (New Window) Street Map (1:25,000)
Town Map (1:50,000)
Road Map (1:100,000)
Road Map (1:200,000)
County Map (1:500,000)
Regional Map (1:1,000,000)
Chronology
DateEvent
1875Change of code to 134
1875Change of code to SALOP
01/01/1935Change of code to 4A
01/02/1950Change of code to 84G
10/09/1960Change of code to 89A
01/09/1963Change of code to 6D
06/03/1967Closed to steam locomotives
13/07/1971Depot closed