Menu
Quick Search
Enter locomotive number in the box below and press 'Go'!
In Touch
Donations
Counter
Visitor Statistics
|
» 23 Online
» 4391 Today
» 4916 Yesterday
» 13965 Week
» 78919 Month
» 281583 Year
» 3308436 Total
|
Record: 10235 (26/09/2023)
(Free MySQL Counter)
|
Depot: Slough
Depot Details
Depot Name |
Slough |
Depot Codes |
Code | From | To | SLO (141) | 1875 | 31/01/1950 | 81B | 01/02/1950 | 31/05/1964 |
|
Date Opened |
11/1840 |
Date Closed |
01/06/1964 |
Pre Grouping Company |
GWR |
Big 4 Company |
GWR |
British Railways Region |
WR |
GWR Division |
LONDON |
1947 Directions |
The shed is on the south side of the main line near to the junction of the Windsor line west of the station. The yard is visible from both lines.
Turn right outside the station into the approach road. Continue into the main road at the top, and the shed entrance is opposite the end of the approach road. Walking time 5 minutes. |
Popup Maps (New Window) |
25 Inch (1892-1914) OS (1:25,000) (1937-1961) OS 7th Series 1 inch (1:63,360) |
Chronology |
Date | Event | 1875 | Change of code to 141 | 1875 | Change of code to SLO | 01/02/1950 | Change of code to 81B |
|
|
|