Menu

Quick Search

Enter locomotive number in the box below and press 'Go'!

Content is coming here as you probably can see. Content is coming here as you probably can see.


?

In Touch

Bookmark and Share

Follow BRDatabase on Twitter

Advertising



Counter

Ad Visitor Statistics
» 5 Online
» 214 Today
» 1073 Yesterday
» 214 Week
» 11785 Month
» 260078 Year
» 1144459 Total
Record: 1668 (12/02/2017)
(Free MySQL Counter)

Depot: Spital Bridge


Depot Details
Depot Name Spital Bridge
Depot Codes
CodeFromTo
9187531/12/1922
M901/01/192331/01/1935
16B01/02/193531/07/1950
35C01/08/195030/06/1958
31F01/07/195831/01/1960
Date Opened 1872
Date Closed 01/02/1960
Pre Grouping Company MR
Big 4 Company LMS
British Railways Region LMR
1947 Directions The shed is on the west side of the L.M.S. and L.N.E. lines north of the North Station. The yard is visible from both lines.

Go straight ahead across the yard outside Peterborough North Station, and turn left into St. Leonards Street. Turn left into Westwood Street, and left again into Mayors Walk. The shed entrance is on the left hand side just past the railway bridge. Walking time 10 minutes.
Popup Maps (New Window) Street Map (1:25,000)
Town Map (1:50,000)
Road Map (1:100,000)
Road Map (1:200,000)
County Map (1:500,000)
Regional Map (1:1,000,000)
Chronology
DateEvent
1872Depot opened
1875Change of code to 9
01/01/1923Change of code to M9
01/01/1935Change of code to 16B
01/08/1950Change of code to 35C
01/07/1958Change of code to 31F
01/02/1960Depot closed