Menu

Quick Search

Enter locomotive number in the box below and press 'Go'!

Content is coming here as you probably can see. Content is coming here as you probably can see.


?

In Touch

Bookmark and Share

Follow BRDatabase on Twitter

Advertising



Counter

Ad Visitor Statistics
» 9 Online
» 859 Today
» 862 Yesterday
» 4407 Week
» 5297 Month
» 313278 Year
» 1197659 Total
Record: 1668 (12/02/2017)
(Free MySQL Counter)

Depot: St Blazey


Depot Details
Depot Name St Blazey
Depot Codes
CodeFromTo
173187531/01/1946
SBZ187531/01/1950
83E01/02/195031/08/1963
84B01/09/196305/05/1973
BZ06/05/1973
Date Opened 01/06/1874
Date Closed 25/04/1987
Pre Grouping Company CMR
Big 4 Company GWR
British Railways Region WR
GWR Division NEWTON ABBOT
1947 Directions The shed is on the west side of the goods line between St. Blazey Station (closed) and Par Harbour (no station).

Turn right along a cinder path outside Par Station. Turn right at the end of this path, under a railway bridge, and over a level crossing. Bear right and the shed entrance is a gate on the right-hand side. Walking time 10 minutes.
Popup Maps (New Window) Street Map (1:25,000)
Town Map (1:50,000)
Road Map (1:100,000)
Road Map (1:200,000)
County Map (1:500,000)
Regional Map (1:1,000,000)
Chronology
DateEvent
01/06/1874Depot opened
1875Change of code to 173
1875Change of code to SBZ
01/02/1950Change of code to 83E
04/1962Closed to steam locomotives
01/09/1963Change of code to 84B
06/05/1973Change of code to BZ
25/04/1987Depot closed