Menu
Quick Search
Enter locomotive number in the box below and press 'Go'!
In Touch
Donations
Counter
Visitor Statistics
|
» 19 Online
» 1475 Today
» 4163 Yesterday
» 14881 Week
» 67897 Month
» 187424 Year
» 3214277 Total
|
Record: 10235 (26/09/2023)
(Free MySQL Counter)
|
Depot: St Leonards
Depot Details
Depot Name |
St Leonards |
Depot Codes |
Code | From | To | STL | 1875 | 31/01/1950 | 74E | 01/02/1950 | 31/05/1958 | 73D | 01/07/1963 | 05/05/1973 | SE | 06/05/1973 | |
|
Big 4 Company |
SR |
1947 Directions |
The shed is at the north side of St. Leonards West Marina Station.
The yard is visible from the line.
The shed entrance is a gate at the back of the eastbound platform. |
Chronology |
Date | Event | 1875 | Change of code to STL | 01/02/1950 | Change of code to 74E | 01/07/1963 | Change of code to 73D | 06/05/1973 | Change of code to SE |
|
|
|