Menu
Quick Search
Enter locomotive number in the box below and press 'Go'!
In Touch
Donations
Counter
Visitor Statistics
|
» 23 Online
» 2622 Today
» 4163 Yesterday
» 16028 Week
» 69044 Month
» 188571 Year
» 3215424 Total
|
Record: 10235 (26/09/2023)
(Free MySQL Counter)
|
Depot: St Philips Marsh
Depot Details
Depot Name |
St Philips Marsh |
Depot Codes |
Code | From | To | SPM (32) | 1875 | 31/01/1950 | 82B | 01/02/1950 | 31/05/1964 |
|
Date Opened |
07/1910 |
Date Closed |
17/06/1964 |
Pre Grouping Company |
GWR |
Big 4 Company |
GWR |
British Railways Region |
WR |
GWR Division |
BRISTOL |
1947 Directions |
The shed is on the south side of the Bristol avoiding line, just before the junction with the Taunton line. The yard is visible from the line. Go straight ahead across the yard outside the main exit from Temple Meads Station. Turn left at the bottom of the hill along Bath Road. Pass the entrance to Bath Road Shed, and a few yards further on turn first left into an alley. (This turning is not too conspicuous`.) Go through this alley and continue over the bridge at the side of the railway; Go down the steps at the end, and continue along a short road that runs parallel to, but below the railway. There is a gate opposite the end of this road and a cinder path leads through it to the shed. Walking time 15 minutes. |
Popup Maps (New Window) |
25 Inch (1892-1914) OS (1:25,000) (1937-1961) OS 7th Series 1 inch (1:63,360) |
Chronology |
Date | Event | 1875 | Change of code to SPM | 1875 | Change of code to 32 | 07/1910 | Depot opened | 01/02/1950 | Change of code to 82B | 17/06/1964 | Depot closed |
|
|
|