Menu

Quick Search

Enter locomotive number in the box below and press 'Go'!

Content is coming here as you probably can see. Content is coming here as you probably can see.


?

In Touch

Bookmark and Share

Follow BRDatabase on Twitter

Advertising



Counter

Ad Visitor Statistics
» 14 Online
» 207 Today
» 1075 Yesterday
» 6919 Week
» 20023 Month
» 20023 Year
» 1241588 Total
Record: 1668 (12/02/2017)
(Free MySQL Counter)

Depot: Staveley (Barrow Hill)


Depot Details
Depot Name Staveley (Barrow Hill)
Depot Codes
CodeFromTo
24187531/12/1922
M2401/01/192331/01/1935
18D01/02/193531/01/1958
41E01/02/195805/05/1973
BH06/05/1973
Date Opened 1870
Date Closed 11/02/1991
Pre Grouping Company MR
Big 4 Company LMS
British Railways Region LMR
1947 Directions The shed is at the side of a goods spur at Barrowhill.

Turn left outside Barrow Hill and Staveley Works Station. A broad path leads from the right hand side of this road to the shed, about 200 yards further on, by a junction of several roads. Walking time 5 minutes.
Popup Maps (New Window) Street Map (1:25,000)
Town Map (1:50,000)
Road Map (1:100,000)
Road Map (1:200,000)
County Map (1:500,000)
Regional Map (1:1,000,000)
Chronology
DateEvent
1870Depot opened
1875Change of code to 24
01/01/1923Change of code to M24
01/01/1935Change of code to 18D
01/02/1958Change of code to 41E
06/05/1973Change of code to BH
11/02/1991Depot closed